Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|