House | 03/27/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 006-002-000 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 007-002-000 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |