House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|