House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-005-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |