House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0026
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|