House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |