House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0796
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|