House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0144
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|