House
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|