House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0296
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-014-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 005-003-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 017-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|