House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|