House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0297
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-036-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|