House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly |