House | 10/31/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |