House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |