House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0027
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 007-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|