House
|
12/08/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-012-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-011-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|