House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0430
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|