House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |