House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0149
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|