House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|