House | 12/09/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver |