House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0153
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|