House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0028
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 036-015-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 022-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|