House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|