House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |