House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0798
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|