House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|