House | 05/28/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |