Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0030
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-032-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 009-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 010-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|