House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0799
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 008-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|