House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |