House | 09/25/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | ||
House | 08/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 07/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |