House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |