Senate
|
09/19/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-043-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|