House | 04/24/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |