House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0031
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date July 1, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 047-007-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-036-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|