House
|
06/29/2024
|
Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
To Violence Reduction & Prevention Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|