House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0032
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 041-011-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 017-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|