House | 03/11/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |