House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0034
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Police & Fire Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|