House | 12/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To Violence Reduction & Prevention Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |