House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0310
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|