House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0530
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 086-027-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-025-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|