House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0036
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-018-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|