House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |