House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|