House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | To Telecom Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |