House
|
12/08/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0569
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Effective Date June 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 098-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 098-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 019-001-001
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 019-001-001
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 019-001-001
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 044-007-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|