Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|